Hawthorne Residential Partners LLC v. Sanders
Plaintiff: Hawthorne Residential Partners LLC
Defendant: Terence Sanders
Case Number: 2:2019cv00099
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER this case is REMANDED back to the District Court of Shelby County Alabama for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/6/2019. (AFS)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:19-cv-99-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER- The General Order calls for reassignment to a district judge following the occurrence of the first of three "triggering events" absent unanimous consent; None of these events have occurred in this case, and it appears that no such event will occur in the timely manner contemplated in the General Order; The case is now due to be assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/1/19. (MRR, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Mr. Sanders is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within ten (10) calendar days why this matter should not be remanded for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction; The court will not rule on the pending motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis until the jurisdictional inquiry is resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/28/19. (MRR, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 1/17/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Terence Sanders. (MRR, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Terence Sanders from District Court of Shelby County, case number 58-DV-2018-900818., filed by Terence Sanders.(MRR, ) Modified text on 3/1/2019 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawthorne Residential Partners LLC v. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawthorne Residential Partners LLC
Represented By: Jim M Sandefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?