Denali Shipping LP v. Van Oil Petroleum LTD
Plaintiff: Denali Shipping LP
Defendant: Van Oil Petroleum LTD
Garnishee: BBVA Compass
Case Number: 2:2019cv00145
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. Upon consideration of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. 29), the court ORDERS that this case be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/5/2019. (FNC)
February 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Denali Shipping LP (Segarra, Jonathan)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING #26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney until new counsel appears on behalf of Plaintiff because Plaintiff cannot proceed pro se. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/25/2019. (JLC)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before March 11, 2019, why the Court should not quash the Writ of Attachment it issued against Compass Bank. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/25/2019. (JLC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Denali Shipping LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal)(Segarra, Jonathan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to re #9 Writ of Attachment and Request to Quash Writ of Attachment filed by BBVA Compass. (Retherford, Jeremy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with Court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan)
February 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with Court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with Court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with Court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form SM-285, along with Court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing U.S. Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with Court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with Court's Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing US Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with Court's Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: In light of the court's Order, (doc. 14), the court FINDS AS MOOT Plaintiff's "Expedited Motion to Deem Service of Process of Attachment and Garnishment to Be Continuous," (doc. 11). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 01/31/2019. (LMG)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 MOTION of Appointment of Special Process Server. To avoid burdening the U.S. Marshal Service with multiple service requests in this action, the Court APPOINTS Maynard, Cooper & Gale as Special Process Server. The Court ORDERS that the service of process of the Writ of Attachment and Garnishment on any garnishee in this action be deemed effective and continuous service of process throughout any given day on which the process is served, through the next day, provided that process is served the next day. The Court also AUTHORIZES service of process by facsimile or e-mail following the initial in personam service of process. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1/31/2019. (JLC)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION appointment of special process server by Denali Shipping LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Rue, Thomas)
January 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Telephone Conference held on 1/31/2019. (Court Reporter Margaret Wasbung.) (FNC)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Van Oil Petroleum LTD., returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service on this the 30th day of January, 2019. (JLC)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION to Deem Service of Process of Attachment and Garnishment to be Continuous by Denali Shipping LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Expedited Motion to Deem Service of Process of Attachment and Garnishment to be Continuous)(Butler, Thomas)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 WRIT of Attachment Returned Executed. (JLC)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 WRIT of Attachment issued, attached as an Exhibit to the Court's #7 Order. (JLC)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Denali Shipping LP. filed by Denali Shipping LP (Butler, Thomas)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF PROCESS OF ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT. For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed simultaneously, the court GRANTS #4 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Appointment of Special Process Server filed by Denali Shipping LP and DIRECTS the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of Alabama to serve this Order and Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment on BBVA Compass Bank. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 01/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Attachment)(LMG)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 01/28/2019. (LMG)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:19-cv-145-KOB (MRR, )
January 28, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3264764, NDAL receipt #B4601094984. (Butler, Thomas) Modified on 1/28/2019 (JLC).
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Appointment of Special Process Server by Denali Shipping LP. (Butler, Thomas)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Prayer for Maritime Attachment by Denali Shipping LP. filed by Denali Shipping LP (Butler, Thomas)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Van Oil Petroleum LTD, filed by Denali Shipping LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Denali Verification)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denali Shipping LP v. Van Oil Petroleum LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denali Shipping LP
Represented By: Thomas Sidney Rue
Represented By: Jonathan Joseph Beren Segarra
Represented By: Thomas J Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Oil Petroleum LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: BBVA Compass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?