Bradley v. Pies & Pints Birmingham LLC

Plaintiff: Brooke Bradley
Defendant: Pies & Pints Birmingham LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00242
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/2/19. (MRR, )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than May 6, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after May 6, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on April 11, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/2/19. (MRR, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pies & Pints Birmingham LLC.(Brown, Whitney)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The defendant has filed an unopposed motion for a two-week extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #5 ). The motion is GRANTED. The defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before March 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/6/19. (MRR, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pies & Pints Birmingham LLC. filed by Pies & Pints Birmingham LLC (Brown, Whitney)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Motion is RIPE 3/6/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Pies & Pints Birmingham LLC. (Brown, Whitney)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on Jennifer Lockwood, Account Assistant on 02/14/2019, filed by Brooke Bradley. (Wrady, Joshua)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pies & Pints Birmingham LLC., returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
February 9, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3275666 (B4601095326). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Pies & Pints Birmingham LLC, filed by Brooke Bradley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Wrady, Joshua) Modified on 2/11/2019 (MRR, ).
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pies & Pints Birmingham LLC, filed by Brooke Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Pies & Pints Birmingham LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Bradley
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Wrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pies & Pints Birmingham LLC
Represented By: Whitney R Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?