Doe v. Hoover City Schools Board of Education et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Martha Harbuck, Heather Miller, Michelle Kaiser, Terri Coleman, Kathy Murphy, Amanda Stone, Hoover City Schools Board of Education and Quincy Collins
Case Number: 2:2019cv00243
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
0 Judge: John H England
1 Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #21 . The motion #21 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motions to dismiss [18, 19] is due on or before May 31, 2019. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/3/2019. (KAM)
April 3, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jane Doe. (Debrosse-Zimmermann, Diandra)
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time by Jane Doe. (Debrosse-Zimmermann, Diandra)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER-This case is before the court on Defendants' motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint [18, 19]. The parties are REMINDED to brief the motions in accordance with Exhibit B to the court's Initial Order #17 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/1/2019. (KAM)
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Terri Coleman, Quincy Collins, Martha Harbuck, Hoover City Schools Board of Education, Michelle Kaiser, Heather Miller, Kathy Murphy, Amanda Stone. (Johnson, Carl)
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Terri Coleman, Quincy Collins, Martha Harbuck, Michelle Kaiser, Heather Miller, Kathy Murphy. (Carr, Clay)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/19/2019. (KAM)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on the motions to dismiss #14 #15 filed by Defendants. In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #12 , which was filed shortly before the motions to dismiss, the motions to dismiss are no longer directed at the operative Complaint. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to administratively terminate the motions to dismiss #14 #15 . On or before March 29, 2019, Defendants SHALL file new responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/15/2019. (KAM)
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Terri Coleman, Quincy Collins, Martha Harbuck, Hoover City Schools Board of Education, Michelle Kaiser, Heather Miller, Kathy Murphy, Amanda Stone. (Johnson, Carl)
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Terri Coleman, Quincy Collins, Martha Harbuck, Michelle Kaiser, Heather Miller, Kathy Murphy, Amanda Stone. (Carr, Clay)
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S Boardman on behalf of Terri Coleman, Quincy Collins, Martha Harbuck, Michelle Kaiser, Heather Miller, Kathy Murphy, Amanda Stone (Boardman, Mark)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Terri Coleman, Quincy Collins, Martha Harbuck, Hoover City Schools Board of Education, Michelle Kaiser, Heather Miller, Kathy Murphy, Amanda Stone, filed by Jane Doe.(Debrosse-Zimmermann, Diandra)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Hoover City Schools Board of Education served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (KAM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Michelle Kaiser served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019; Kathy Murphy served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019; Amanda Stone served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (green cards for Murphy and Stone are signed, not dated) (KAM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Terri Coleman served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019; Quincy Collins served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019; Martha Harbuck served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (KAM)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Heather Miller served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (KEK)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Terri Coleman, Quincy Collins, Martha Harbuck, Hoover City Schools Board of Education, Michelle Kaiser, Heather Miller, Kathy Murphy, Amanda Stone mailed certified mail. (AFS)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion Motion to Proceed Under a Pseudonym; However, the granting of the motion is WITHOUT PREJUDICE to allowing Defendants to object to Plaintiff proceeding under a pseudonym, if they deem it appropriate, once they make an appearance. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/12/2019. (KAM)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION To Proceed Under A Pseudonym by Jane Doe. (Debrosse-Zimmermann, Diandra)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL Magistrate Judge John H England, III RECUSES himself from further participation in this matter. Case reassigned to Judge R David Proctor for all further proceedings. Please use case number 2:19-cv-00243-JHE for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 2/11/2019. (AFS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
February 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400,(ALND receipt # B4601095325) receipt_number 1126-3275510. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Terri Coleman, Quincy Collins, Martha Harbuck, Hoover City Schools Board of Education, Michelle Kaiser, Heather Miller, Kathy Murphy, Amanda Stone, filed by Jane Doe.(AFS). (Debrosse-Zimmermann, Diandra) Modified on 2/11/2019 (AFS).
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jane Doe. (AFS)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Terri Coleman, Quincy Collins, Martha Harbuck, Hoover City Schools Board of Education, Michelle Kaiser, Heather Miller, Kathy Murphy, Amanda Stone, filed by Jane Doe.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Hoover City Schools Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Diandra S Debrosse-Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Harbuck
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Miller
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Kaiser
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Coleman
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Murphy
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Stone
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoover City Schools Board of Education
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Collins
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?