Dunn v. Western Supermarkets Inc

Plaintiff: Patrick Dunn
Defendant: Western Supermarkets Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00325
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Supermarkets Inc. filed by Western Supermarkets Inc (Davis, Thomas)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Western Supermarkets Inc.(Davis, Thomas)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Patrick Dunn of Service of Rule 34 Request to Permit Entry onto Designated Land and Property (Burns, Heather)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Patrick Dunn of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Burns, Heather)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Western Supermarket, Inc.'s motion for an extension of time to file its response to Mr. Dunn's complaint. (Doc. #7 ). Western shall file its answer on or before April 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 03/25/2019. (EES)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Western Supermarkets Inc. (Davis, Thomas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Dunn. Western Supermarkets Inc served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (KEK)
February 28, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601095697. (KEK)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Western Supermarkets Inc. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The Court recognizes that many Title III ADA claims are resolved by agreement between the parties. Therefore, the Court releases the parties from their initial obligation to confer and propose scheduling deadlines. Instead, the Court directs the parties to please make their initial disclosures within 14 days of Western Supermarket's appearance in this action. Within 30 days of their exchange of initial disclosures, the Court directs the parties to meet and confer to explore the possibility of settlement. Within 30 days of their meeting, the parties shall please file a joint notice apprising the Court of the status of their efforts to resolve this matter. If it does not appear that the parties are able to resolve Mr. Dunn's Title III claim through their initial discussions, then the Court will place the matter on an expedited discovery track. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 02/27/2019. (EES)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Patrick Dunn (KAM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Patrick Dunn. (KAM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western Supermarkets Inc, filed by Patrick Dunn.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Western Supermarkets Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Supermarkets Inc
Represented By: Thomas A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Dunn
Represented By: L Landis Sexton
Represented By: Heather Alison Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?