Black Warrior River-Keeper Inc v. US Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Black Warrior River-Keeper Inc
Defendant: US Environmental Protection Agency, Mary Walker and Andrew Wheeler
Case Number: 2:2019cv00344
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sydney A Menees on behalf of US Environmental Protection Agency, Mary Walker, Andrew Wheeler (Menees, Sydney)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on All Defendants, plus U. S. Attorney General and U. S. Attorney for the N. D. of Alabama on March 11, 2019, filed by Black Warrior River-Keeper Inc. (Dillard, Eva)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to US Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler given back to plaintiff for service. (AFS)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mary Walker, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General returned to Plaintiff for Service. (AFS)
February 28, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601095734) receipt_number 1126-3289440. related document #1 COMPLAINT against US Environmental Protection Agency, Mary Walker, Andrew Wheeler, filed by Black Warrior River-Keeper Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(KEK). (Dillard, Eva) Modified on 3/4/2019 (AFS).
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Black Warrior River-Keeper Inc. (KEK)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Black Warrior River-Keeper Inc. (KEK)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US Environmental Protection Agency, Mary Walker, Andrew Wheeler, filed by Black Warrior River-Keeper Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black Warrior River-Keeper Inc v. US Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Sydney A Menees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Walker
Represented By: Sydney A Menees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Sydney A Menees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Warrior River-Keeper Inc
Represented By: Eva L Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?