M-D Medical Services, Inc. v. M.A.S.H., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: M-D Medical Services, Inc.
Defendant: M.A.S.H., Inc., Gregory L. Horn and Charles Bordenca
Case Number: 2:2019cv00390
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS #8 "Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay" and STAYS this action pending the resolution of the motion to transfer currently pending in a related action in the Southern District of Mississippi. The court ORDERS the parties to jointly file a status report on or before May 15, 2019, or as soon as the Mississippi court resolves the motion to transfer. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/16/19. (CAK2)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by Charles Bordenca, Gregory L. Horn, M.A.S.H., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Richie, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M-D Medical Services, Inc.. Charles Bordenca served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (JLC)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 "Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Complaint." The Defendants' responsive pleadings are now due on or before April 15, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/27/19. (MMW)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Complaint by Charles Bordenca, Gregory L. Horn, M.A.S.H., Inc.. (Richie, John)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M-D Medical Services, Inc. M.A.S.H., Inc. served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (JLC)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M-D Medical Services, Inc.. Gregory L. Horn served, date of delivery omitted. (JLC)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charles Bordenca, Gregory L. Horn and M.A.S.H., Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 6th day of March, 2019. (Certified Mail Request filed within Complaint). (JLC)
March 6, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3294169, NDAL receipt #B4601095895. (Thayer, Richard) Modified on 3/6/2019 (JLC).
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Bordenca, Gregory L. Horn, M.A.S.H., Inc., filed by M-D Medical Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M-D Medical Services, Inc. v. M.A.S.H., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A.S.H., Inc.
Represented By: John Thomas Richie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L. Horn
Represented By: John Thomas Richie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Bordenca
Represented By: John Thomas Richie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M-D Medical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M Thayer
Represented By: Richard E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?