Nelson v. Tractor Supply Company Inc

Plaintiff: Janice Nelson
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00470
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bostick, Brian)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER. The scheduling conference now set for July 2, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby CANCELED. The parties are ORDERED to file their Rule 26(f) report no later than July 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 07/01/2019. (Borden, Gray)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 7/2/2019, at 10:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL, in chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/21/2019. (PMA)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/21/2019. (ASL)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER status conference scheduled for 10:30 AM on Tuesday, May 21, 2019, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/20/2019. (ASL)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled for 10:30 AM on Tuesday, May 21, 2019, in chambers; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be cancelled (ASL)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janice Nelson. Tractor Supply Company Inc served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Camp, Robert)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than June 14, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after June 14, 2019. A status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 am on May 21, 2019, in chambers. The conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/2/19. (MRR, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tractor Supply Company Inc. filed by Tractor Supply Company Inc (Bostick, Brian)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tractor Supply Company Inc.(Bostick, Brian)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tractor Supply Company Inc., returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
March 21, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601096247 (MRR, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tractor Supply Company Inc, filed by Janice Nelson.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Tractor Supply Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company Inc
Represented By: Josh C Harrison
Represented By: Brian R Bostick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Nelson
Represented By: Robert J Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?