Porter v. CVS Health Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Tiffany M. Porter
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and CVS Rx Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00472
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re: #9 GRANTING CVSs motion to conduct limited discovery only onthe issue of whether Ms. Porter opted out of the arbitration agreement. The parties shall complete this limited discovery on or before August 30, 2019,and shall file a joint status report of the discovery on or before that same day. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/27/2019. (KEK)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's amended complaint is now the operative pleading, so the court finds as MOOT Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's original complaint. The court recognizes that Defendant's renewed motion to dismiss relies on the same brief as its original motion to dismiss, so the court will consider that brief together with Defendant's renewed motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 06/26/2019.(MCP)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to re #9 in Support of Motion to Conduct Limited Discovery on Issues Related to Arbitration filed by CVS Rx Services, Inc.. (Busby, Jennifer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Rx Services, Inc.. filed by CVS Rx Services, Inc. (Busby, Jennifer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed) or, Alternatively, to Stay, and to Compel Arbitration by CVS Rx Services, Inc.. (Busby, Jennifer)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany M. Porter. CVS Rx Services, Inc. served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (JLC)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Discovery (to Conduct Limited Discovery on Issues Related to Arbitration) filed by Tiffany M. Porter. (Haynes, Kenneth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to CVS Rx Services, Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 3rd day of June, 2019. (JLC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Tiffany M. Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Supplement Request for Service by Certified Mail, #5 Supplement Summons)(Haynes, Kenneth)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS #12 "Plaintiff Tiffany Porter's Motion for Leave to Amend Original Complaint." Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 5/23/19. (CAK2)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend Original Complaint by Tiffany M. Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haynes, Kenneth)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy J Wilkes on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Wilkes, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Conduct Limited Discovery on Issues Related to Arbitration. Responses due on or before June 10, 2019. Replies due on or before June 24, 2019. (JLC)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 MOTION to Conduct Limited Discovery on Issues Related to Arbitration. Plaintiff Tiffany Porter is hereby ORDERED to file her Response in Opposition to CVS's #9 Motion on or before June 10, 2019. If necessary, CVS shall file its Reply on or before June 24, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 5/20/2019. (JLC)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery (to Conduct Limited Discovery on Issues Related to Arbitration) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Busby, Jennifer)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Stay and to Compel Arbitration filed by Tiffany M. Porter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tiffany Porter)(Haynes, Kenneth)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - This matter comes before the court on Defendants CVS Health Corporation and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, or, Alternatively, to Stay, and to Compel Arbitration. (Doc. #4 ). The court ORDERS Plaintiff Tiffany Porter to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before May 10, 2019, why the court should not grant Defendants motion and compel this case to arbitration. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/26/2019. (KEK)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Busby, Jennifer)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Brief re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Stay and to Compel Arbitration filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Busby, Jennifer)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Stay and to Compel Arbitration by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Busby, Jennifer)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany M. Porter. CVS Health Corporation served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019; CVS Pharmacy, Inc. served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (JLC)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
March 28, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3311178, NDAL receipt #B4601096383. (Haynes, Kenneth) Modified on 3/28/2019 (JLC).
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., filed by Tiffany M. Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy J Wilkes
Represented By: Jennifer M Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Amy J Wilkes
Represented By: Jennifer M Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Rx Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amy J Wilkes
Represented By: Caroline Houston Page
Represented By: Jennifer M Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany M. Porter
Represented By: Kenneth D Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?