Bester v. Roco Real Estate LLC et al

Plaintiff: Isaac Bester
Defendant: Roco Real Estate LLC and Roco Management LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00541
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Evans, Daniel)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/5/19. (SAC )
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:19-cv-541-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER The telephone status conference set for Wednesday, June 5, 2019, at 10:00 AM is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on June 3, 2019. (TNC)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 7, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 7, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 am on June 5, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/24/19. (MRR, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/24/19. (MRR, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Roco Management LLC, Roco Real Estate LLC.(Sherman, Colin)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants shall file a responsive pleading no later than May 24, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/26/2019. (PMA)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 4/26/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Roco Management LLC, Roco Real Estate LLC. (Sherman, Colin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Roco Management LLC served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019; Roco Real Estate LLC served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (MRR, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin D Sherman on behalf of All Defendants (Sherman, Colin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Roco Management LLC, Roco Real Estate LLC, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
April 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3318888 (B4601096683). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Isaac Bester.(MRR, ). (Evans, Daniel) Modified on 4/10/2019 (MRR, ).
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Isaac Bester. (MRR, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Isaac Bester.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bester v. Roco Real Estate LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Bester
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Daniel E Arciniegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roco Real Estate LLC
Represented By: Colin D Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roco Management LLC
Represented By: Colin D Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?