McMurray v. Formel D

Plaintiff: Allen L McMurray
Defendant: Formel D
Case Number: 2:2019cv00548
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/25/2019. (AFS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 8/8/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 8/8/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on 7/24/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/25/2019. (AFS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Formel D. filed by Formel D (Harrison, Josh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Formel D.(Harrison, Josh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Allen L McMurray (Attachments: #1 Supplement Consent to Join Collective Action)(Cooks, Roderick)
June 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Joint FLSA Collective Action - Tommy Williams by Allen L McMurray re #5 MOTION to Certify Class (Cooks, Roderick) Modified on 6/10/2019 (AFS).
June 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Joint FLSA Collective Action - Antonio Rodgers by Allen L McMurray re #5 MOTION to Certify Class (Cooks, Roderick) Modified on 6/10/2019 (AFS).
June 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Joint FLSA Collective Action - Naomi Harrell by Allen L McMurray re #5 MOTION to Certify Class (Cooks, Roderick) Modified on 6/10/2019 (AFS).
June 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Joint FLSA Collective Action - Jonathin Green by Allen L McMurray re #5 MOTION to Certify Class (Cooks, Roderick) Modified on 6/10/2019 (AFS).
June 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Joint FLSA Collective Action - Homer Fuller by Allen L McMurray re #5 MOTION to Certify Class (Cooks, Roderick) Modified on 6/10/2019 (AFS).
June 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Joint FLSA Collective Action - Mary Dussett by Allen L McMurray re #5 MOTION to Certify Class (Cooks, Roderick) Modified on 6/10/2019 (AFS).
June 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Joint FLSA Collective Action - Hayes Broom Jr. by Allen L McMurray re #5 MOTION to Certify Class (Cooks, Roderick) Modified on 6/10/2019 (AFS).
June 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Conditional Certification and for Judicial Notice by Allen L McMurray. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion for Conditional Certification, #2 Exhibit Ex.1-Declaration of Allen L. McMurray, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2-Declaration of Hayes E. Broom, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3-Declaration of Mary Dusett, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4-Declaration of Jonathin Green, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5-Declaration of Antonio Rodgers, #7 Supplement Notice of Pending Wage and Hour Lawsuit)(Cooks, Roderick)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Formel D mailed certified mail. (AFS)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Allen L McMurray. (Cooks, Roderick)
May 30, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, (alnd B4601098036) receipt_number 1126-3357136. related document #1 Collective Action COMPLAINT against Formel D, filed by Allen L McMurray.(AFS). (Cooks, Roderick) Modified on 5/30/2019 (AFS).
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 Collective Action COMPLAINT against Formel D, filed by Allen L McMurray.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMurray v. Formel D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Formel D
Represented By: Josh C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen L McMurray
Represented By: Charity Gilchrist-Davis
Represented By: Lee David Winston
Represented By: Roderick T Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?