Hicks v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Plaintiff: Brandi Hicks
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 2:2019cv00554
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The parties have filed a Notice of Settlement. (Doc. #12 ). On or before July 30, 2019, the parties shall please file a stipulation of dismissal or a joint report updating the Court on the status of the settlement. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/8/2019. (YMB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston Notice of Settlement (Rademaekers, Iwana)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. (Doc. #10 ). The Court extends the deadline to submit the Joint Report and Administrative Record to July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/6/2019. (YMB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report and Administrative Record by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS Attorney Matthew W. Robinett's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Iwana Rademaekers. (Doc. #6 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 5/20/2019. (YMB)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Robinett, Matthew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Robinett, Matthew)
May 17, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3349521 (ALND B4601097789). (Robinett, Matthew) Modified on 5/20/2019 (KEK).
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Robinett, Matthew) Modified on 5/20/2019 (KEK).
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandi Hicks. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (KEK)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Brandi Hicks. (Burke, Peter)
April 18, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3326647 (ALND B4601096924) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, filed by Brandi Hicks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W)(KEK). (Burke, Peter) Modified on 4/18/2019 (KEK).
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER IN ERISA BENEFITS CASES. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/12/2019. (KEK)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, filed by Brandi Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Matthew Robinett
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Hicks
Represented By: Peter H Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?