Caldwell v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Matthew B Caldwell
Defendant: Caring for Montannans, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Mississippi, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc., Nordian Mutual Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nebraska, BlueCross BlueShield of Western New York, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Community Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., CareFirst, Inc., Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Highmark, Inc., Capital Blue Cross, Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Horizon Health Care Services, Inc., Regence BlueShield, Triple-S Salud, Inc., Highmark Health Services, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nevada, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico, BlueCross BlueShield of South Carolina Inc., Highmark West Virginia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., Louisiana Health Service and Indemnity Company, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc., Wellmark, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc., Hawaii Medical Service Association, HealthNow New York Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Oklahoma, BlueCross BlueShield of Montana, Blue Cross of California, Anthem, Inc., BlueShield of Northeastern New York, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Excellus Health Plan, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Health Care Service Corporation and California Physicians' Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00565
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on the Motion of Certain Defendants to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. #15 . The Motion #15 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants' personal jurisdiction and venue defenses are DEEMED PRESERVED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/24/20198. (KAM)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc..(Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc..(Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nebraska.(Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., HealthNow New York Inc., Nordian Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dimiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - BCBS-AZ Affidavit of Erin Entringer, #3 Exhibit 2 - BCBS-KS Affidavit of Treena Mason, #4 Exhibit 3 - BCBS-WY Affidavit of Kris Urbanek, #5 Exhibit 4 - HealthNow Affidavit of David Horn, #6 Exhibit 5 - BCBS-ND Affidavit of Dorinda Card)(Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc.. filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc. (Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nordian Mutual Insurance Company. filed by Nordian Mutual Insurance Company (Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming. filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming (Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nebraska. filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nebraska (Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. (Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.. filed by Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc. (Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HealthNow New York Inc.. filed by HealthNow New York Inc. (Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.. filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. (Sooy, Kathleen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Honor R Costello on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., HealthNow New York Inc., Nordian Mutual Insurance Company (Costello, Honor)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M. Gilbert on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., HealthNow New York Inc., Nordian Mutual Insurance Company (Gilbert, Sarah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy A Roman on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., HealthNow New York Inc., Nordian Mutual Insurance Company (Roman, Tracy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Taylor Sooy on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., HealthNow New York Inc., Nordian Mutual Insurance Company (Sooy, Kathleen)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge R David Proctor for inclusion in MDL 2406 (Master File No.: 2:13-CV-20000-RDP); Judge Annemarie Carney Axon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/15/2019. (KAM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Matthew B Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caring for Montannans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueCross BlueShield of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordian Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Tracy A Roman
Represented By: Honor R Costello
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Sarah M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nebraska
Represented By: Tracy A Roman
Represented By: Honor R Costello
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Sarah M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueCross BlueShield of Western New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCBSM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CareFirst, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Blue Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy A Roman
Represented By: Honor R Costello
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Sarah M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming
Represented By: Tracy A Roman
Represented By: Honor R Costello
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Sarah M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Health Care Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence BlueShield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple-S Salud, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy A Roman
Represented By: Honor R Costello
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Sarah M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueCross BlueShield of South Carolina Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark West Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Health Service and Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambia Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence Blue Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premera Blue Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy A Roman
Represented By: Honor R Costello
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Sarah M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Medical Service Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthNow New York Inc.
Represented By: Tracy A Roman
Represented By: Honor R Costello
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Sarah M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueCross BlueShield of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueShield of Northeastern New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy A Roman
Represented By: Honor R Costello
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Sarah M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark BCBSD, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excellus Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMO Missouri, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Physicians' Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew B Caldwell
Represented By: Robert J Axelrod
Represented By: Christina D Crow
Represented By: Aaron S Podhurst
Represented By: Patrick J Sheehan
Represented By: Nicholas B Roth
Represented By: Lynn W Jinks, III
Represented By: Molly Brown
Represented By: Joseph Preston Strom, Jr
Represented By: Brian E Wojtalewicz
Represented By: Harley S Tropin
Represented By: Myron C Penn
Represented By: John Clark Davis
Represented By: Dennis Craig Reich
Represented By: Linda G Flippo
Represented By: J Mark White
Represented By: Deborah J Winegard
Represented By: Dennis G Pantazis
Represented By: Dirk L Hubbard
Represented By: Joey K James
Represented By: Van Bunch
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Gwendolyn J Simons
Represented By: Robert B Roden
Represented By: Michael C Dodge
Represented By: Thomas Bender
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Represented By: Archie C Lamb, Jr
Represented By: Augusta S Dowd
Represented By: Ray R Brown
Represented By: Julia Smeds Roth
Represented By: Stephen M Hansen
Represented By: Edith M Kallas
Represented By: Cynthia C Moser
Represented By: Edward K Wood, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Gurley, Jr
Represented By: Gregory S Cusimano
Represented By: U W Clemon
Represented By: Lance Michael Sears
Represented By: Mark K Gray
Represented By: Javier Asis Lopez
Represented By: W Tucker Brown
Represented By: David A Balto
Represented By: Brian M Clark
Represented By: Joe R Whatley, Jr
Represented By: C Wes Pittman
Represented By: Richard S Frankowski
Represented By: Paul Lundberg
Represented By: Henry C Quillen
Represented By: Jessica Dillon
Represented By: Charles C Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?