Dentici v. China Way LLC

Plaintiff: Julie-Anne Dentici
Defendant: China Way LLC and China Way 1 LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00574
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie-Anne Dentici. China Way 1 LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Zwilling, Edward)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to China Way 1 LLC. del to plaintiff (KAM)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against China Way 1 LLC, filed by Julie-Anne Dentici.(Zwilling, Edward)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to China Way LLC. delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
April 29, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3333409. related document #1 COMPLAINT against China Way LLC, filed by Julie-Anne Dentici.(KAM). (Zwilling, Edward) NDAL rec# B4601097091 Modified on 5/3/2019 (KAM, ).
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against China Way LLC, filed by Julie-Anne Dentici.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dentici v. China Way LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Way LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Way 1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie-Anne Dentici
Represented By: Edward I Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?