Lothrop v. Xtreme Concepts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clinton Lothrop, III
Defendant: iK9 LLC, Xtreme Concepts, Inc. and Landon Ash
Case Number: 2:2019cv00609
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/24/2019. (AFS)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 8/6/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 8/6/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:45 a.m. on 7/22/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/24/2019. (AFS)
June 22, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Landon Ash, Xtreme Concepts, Inc., iK9 LLC.(Erskine, Tamera)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Xtreme Concepts, Inc., iK9 LLC. filed by Xtreme Concepts, Inc., iK9 LLC (Erskine, Tamera)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamera K Erskine on behalf of All Defendants (Erskine, Tamera)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Xtreme Concepts, Inc.. Xtreme Concepts, Inc. waiver sent on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Erskine, Tamera)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by iK9 LLC. iK9 LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Erskine, Tamera)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Landon Ash. Landon Ash waiver sent on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Erskine, Tamera)
April 23, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601097005) receipt_number 1126-3329723. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Landon Ash, Xtreme Concepts, Inc., iK9 LLC, filed by Clinton Lothrop, III.(AFS). (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 4/23/2019 (AFS).
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Clinton Lothrop, III. (AFS)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Clinton Lothrop, III. (AFS)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Landon Ash, Xtreme Concepts, Inc., iK9 LLC, filed by Clinton Lothrop, III.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lothrop v. Xtreme Concepts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iK9 LLC
Represented By: Tamera K Erskine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xtreme Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Tamera K Erskine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landon Ash
Represented By: Tamera K Erskine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Lothrop, III
Represented By: Allen Durham Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?