Short v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: Ronny Short
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00675
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronny Short. 3M Company served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (KEK)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Florida Northern for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transmitted to Clerk of Court in District of Florida Northern. (KEK)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 5/9/2019. (KEK)
May 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3342327 (ALND B4601097532) related document #1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, filed by Ronny Short.(KEK). (Pantazis, Dennis) Modified on 5/9/2019 (KEK).
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended against 3M Company, filed by Ronny Short.(Pantazis, Dennis)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Mr. Shorts complaint fails to properly allege the citizenship of 3M. Mr. Short alleges that 3M is a citizen of Delaware. (Doc. #1 , p. 1, 3). In order to properly plead the citizenship of 3M, Mr. Short must allege 3Ms principal place of business and state of incorporation. On or before May 13, 2019, Mr. Short shall please file an amended complaint in which it he sufficiently pleads the 3Ms citizenship. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 5/7/2019. (KEK)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Ronny Short. (KEK)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, filed by Ronny Short.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronny Short
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?