Tillman v. Roddam et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Tillman
Defendant: Doctor Roddam and Doctor Butler
Case Number: 2:2019cv00749
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Court having received the Plaintiff's signed #4 Prisoner Consent Form, the Warden is hereby directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Nathan Tillman until the full Filing Fee has been withheld and paid to the Clerk of the Court to satisfy the docket fee required by the filing of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/3/2019. (JLC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of signed Prisoner Consent Form by Nathan Tillman. (JLC)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court concludes that Plaintiff is not capable of paying an Initial Partial Filing Fee. However, if he wishes to proceeds with this action, Plaintiff shall remain obligated to pay the full filing fee to be deducted from his prison or jail trust account. Plaintiff is also required to sign and return the attached Prisoner Consent Form within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order or the complaint will be dismissed WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/21/2019. (JLC)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nathan Tillman. (JLC)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doctor Butler, Doctor Roddam, filed by Nathan Tillman.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman v. Roddam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Roddam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?