Effinger v. Birmingham Jefferson County Transit Authority

Plaintiff: Synethia Effinger
Defendant: Birmingham Jefferson County Transit Authority
Case Number: 2:2019cv00766
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:0790
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/17/2019. (FNC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reiss, Sandra)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee David Winston on behalf of Synethia Effinger (Winston, Lee)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS #8 "Motion for Leave to Withdraw." Attorney Steven Michael Stastny terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/26/19. (CAK2)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Synethia Effinger. (Stastny, Steven)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Roderick T Cooks on behalf of Synethia Effinger (Cooks, Roderick)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/13/2019. (FNC)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Birmingham Jefferson County Transit Authority.(Casey, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Synethia Effinger. Birmingham Jefferson County Transit Authority served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (JLC)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Birmingham Jefferson County Transit Authority via certified U.S. Mail on this the 21st day of May, 2019. (JLC)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Synethia Effinger. (JLC)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Birmingham Jefferson County Transit Authority (Filing Fee $400.00 receipt #B4601097831), filed by Synethia Effinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Effinger v. Birmingham Jefferson County Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham Jefferson County Transit Authority
Represented By: Michael A Casey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synethia Effinger
Represented By: Steven Michael Stastny
Represented By: Sandra B Reiss
Represented By: Lee David Winston
Represented By: Roderick T Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?