Litvine v. Belk Inc.

Plaintiff: Susan Litvine
Defendant: Belk Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00777
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER This case is before the court on Defendants Motion to Stay this Action and to Compel Arbitration; this action is STAYED pending arbitration. The parties are ORDERED to arbitrate all arbitrable issues in this action. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to administratively close this case. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/9/2019. (KAM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Stay this Action MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Susan Litvine. (Smith, L)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Defendant's Motion to Stay this Action and to Compel Arbitration #4 . The parties are ORDERED to brief the motion as follows: Plaintiff SHALL respond to the motion on or before July 3, 2019; Defendant MAY reply on or before July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/21/2019. (KAM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Belk Inc.. filed by Belk Inc. (Warren, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay this Action, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Belk Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tab 1 - Declaration of Cathy Halstead)(Warren, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Litvine. Belk Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Goldfarb, Jon)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Belk Inc. delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
May 22, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3352882. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Belk Inc., filed by Susan Litvine.(KAM). (Goldfarb, Jon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Belk Inc., filed by Susan Litvine.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Litvine v. Belk Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belk Inc.
Represented By: David L Warren, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Litvine
Represented By: Christina Maxine Malmat
Represented By: L William Smith
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?