Bowman et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Keith Bowman and Lisa Bowman
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Scott Mims, Mimsco Inc, Altisource Solutions Inc and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00831
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:19-cv-831-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Altisource Solutions Inc (Paul, Eris)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Keith Bowman, Lisa Bowman. (Clark, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Altisource Solutions Inc.(Paul, Eris)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lacy Michele Triplett on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation (Triplett, Lacy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Reeves, T)
July 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 7/8/2019; attys John Clark, IV and Dylan Reeves present by telephone; conference adj. (chambers) (MSN)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The defendants are ORDERED to file a response to the motion to remand (Doc. #13 ) within fourteen calendar days of the date of this order. The plaintiffs SHALL file any reply within seven calendar days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/27/19. (MRR, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State Court by Keith Bowman, Lisa Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2005 Ala. Sup. Ct. Order, #2 Exhibit 2011 Ala. Admin. Order, #3 Affidavit Declaration of John W. Clark IV, #4 Exhibit Notice of Service on PHH, #5 Exhibit Notice of Service on Ocwen, #6 Exhibit Notice of Service on Altisource, #7 Exhibit Notice of Service on S. Mims)(Clark, John)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiffs' unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the pending motion for more definite statement is GRANTED. (Doc. #11 ). The briefing on the pending motion for more definite statement (Doc. #4 ) is STAYED pending further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/21/19. (MRR, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for More Definite Statement , 5 Order, Motion is RIPE 6/17/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Keith Bowman, Lisa Bowman. (Clark, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to re #7 - NOTICE Regarding Diversity filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Altisource Secretary of State, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Mimsco Secretary of State)(Reeves, T) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (MRR, ).
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage Corporation. filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation (Reeves, T)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (Reeves, T)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER- PHH Mortgage Corporation and Ocwen Loan SErvicing, LLC are ORDERED to file a notice containing information which allows the court to determine their citizenships and, by extension, the existence of federal; diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/10/19. (MRR, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 22, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 22, 2109. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on July 8, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/7/19. (MRR, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiffs are ORDERED to file any response to the pending motion for more definite statement (Doc. #4 ) within fourteen calendar days of the date of this order. The moving defendants SHALL file any reply within seven calendar days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/7/19. (MRR, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Reeves, T)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 3. (Reeves, T)
May 30, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3357813 (B4601098049). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation from Circuit Court of Shelby County, case number 58-cv-2019-900523., filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(MRR, ). (Reeves, T) Modified on 5/31/2019 (MRR, ).
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation from Circuit Court of Shelby County, case number 58-cv-2019-900523., filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Lacy Michele Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mimsco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Solutions Inc
Represented By: Eris Bryan Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Lacy Michele Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bowman
Represented By: John W Clark, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Bowman
Represented By: John W Clark, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?