Blakely v. The Coleman Company Inc
Plaintiff: Val Blakely
Defendant: The Coleman Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00880
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/17/2019. (KAM)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/17/2019. (KAM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Hipaa Order and Stipulated Protective Order by The Coleman Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Proposed HIPAA Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Stipulated Protective Order)(McKibben, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McKibben, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge R David Proctor. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:19-cv-00880-RDP. The status conference set for 7/10/2019 at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. (AFS)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/11/2019. (AFS)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 7/22/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 7/22/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on 7/10/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/11/2019. (AFS)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Coleman Company Inc. filed by The Coleman Company Inc (McKibben, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Coleman Company Inc.(McKibben, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Coleman Company Inc from Circuit Court of Blount County Alabama, case number 08-cv-2019-900120.00., filed by The Coleman Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakely v. The Coleman Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coleman Company Inc
Represented By: Jonathan C Hill
Represented By: Michael D McKibben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Val Blakely
Represented By: Richard Phillips
Represented By: John Bradley Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?