Cotton et al v. Walden et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Cotton and Keith Richard Cotton
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Jerry Glen Walden and Christopher Thomas James
Case Number: 2:2019cv00901
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc (Tucker, Steve)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Keith Richard Cotton, Tiffany Cotton Affidavit of Service on Def Walden (Holland, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Keith Richard Cotton, Tiffany Cotton Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service (Holland, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Keith Richard Cotton, Tiffany Cotton Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Defendant)(Holland, James)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/31/2019. (AFS)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 9/16/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 9/16/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on 8/30/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/31/2019. (AFS)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Christopher Thomas James, Jerry Glen Walden.(Franklin, Patrick)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John M Graham on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc (Graham, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Norfolk Southern Railway Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc.(Tucker, Steve)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Christopher Thomas James, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Jerry Glen Walden returned to plaintiff in SASE for service. (AFS)
June 19, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number B4601098524 (AFS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Thomas James, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Jerry Glen Walden, filed by Tiffany Cotton, Keith Richard Cotton.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotton et al v. Walden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Represented By: Steve A Tucker
Represented By: John M Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Glen Walden
Represented By: Patrick W Franklin
Represented By: Paul Albert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Thomas James
Represented By: Patrick W Franklin
Represented By: Paul Albert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Cotton
Represented By: James R Holland, II
Represented By: Rex W Slate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Richard Cotton
Represented By: James R Holland, II
Represented By: Rex W Slate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?