Wilson v. J & M Tank Lines Inc
Plaintiff: Harry Lee Wilson, Jr
Defendant: J & M Tank Lines Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00918
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed J & M Tank Lines Inc served on 7/24/2019 (No date on green card). (AFS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to J & M Tank Lines Inc. mailed certified mail. (AFS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing EEOC forms by Harry Lee Wilson, Jr (AFS)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action.(AFS)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Employment Discrimination against J & M Tank Lines (Filing fee $400. ALND B4601098446), filed by Harry Lee Wilson, Jr.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. J & M Tank Lines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Lee Wilson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & M Tank Lines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?