MGF Healthcare Partners Inc v. Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC et al
Plaintiff: MGF Healthcare Partners Inc
Defendant: Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC, Blue Ridge Healthcare Management and Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00926
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management, Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC, Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC Second Requests for Admission (Carroll, Hunter)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MGF Healthcare Partners Inc. (Breibart, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT SUBMISSION ORDER re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC and #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management. Plaintiff shall file any opposition or other response to the motions to dismiss by August 14, 2019; Movants may reply thereto by August 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 7/31/2019. (SJB)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 9/13/2019 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate judge. Telephone Conference set for 8/29/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott. Parties are to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 8/29/2019, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 7/31/2019. (KAM)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 7/31/2019. (BST)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC.(Carroll, Hunter)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC.(Carroll, Hunter)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Levi Rudd)(Carroll, Hunter)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Levi Rudd)(Carroll, Hunter)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MGF Healthcare Partners Inc. filed by MGF Healthcare Partners Inc (Breibart, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management, Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC, Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO PLAINTIFF (Carroll, Hunter)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management, Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC. filed by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management, Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Amended Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Amended Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Amended Notice of Removal)(Carroll, Hunter)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Defendants shall show cause in writing why this action is not due to be dismissed without prejudice for want of jurisdiction; Show Cause Response due by 7/9/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 7/2/2019. (KAM)
June 27, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3379621. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management, Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC, Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC from Jefferson County Circurt Court - Bessemer, case number 2019-cv-900056., filed by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management, Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC, Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KAM). (Carroll, Hunter)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER. Defendants removed this action on 6/17/2019. A review of the docket sheet does not reveal, however, that Defendants have paid the applicable filing fee upon removal. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to pay the fee by July 3, 2019. Failure to comply will render this action subject to remand without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/27/2019. (SJB)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management, Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC, Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC. filed by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management, Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC, Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC (Carroll, Hunter)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management, Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC, Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC from Jefferson County Circurt Court - Bessemer, case number 2019-cv-900056., filed by Blue Ridge Healthcare Management, Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC, Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MGF Healthcare Partners Inc v. Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC
Represented By: Hunter C Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ridge Healthcare Management
Represented By: Hunter C Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ridge Heathcare Birmingham LLC
Represented By: Hunter C Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MGF Healthcare Partners Inc
Represented By: Richard M Breibart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?