Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC v. Colonial Pipeline Company
Plaintiff: Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC
Defendant: Colonial Pipeline Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00970
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/21/2019. (CDG)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion is RIPE 8/21/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC. (Martino, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/13/2019. (AFS)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 9/27/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 9/27/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on 9/13/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/13/2019. (AFS)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Colonial Pipeline Company. Plaintiff's response is due by August 26, 2019. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by September 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/13/2019. (CDG)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Corrective Action Order, #3 Exhibit B - Comprehensive Investigation Report, #4 Exhibit C - Groundwater Sampling Event Report, #5 Exhibit D - ARBCA Evaluation Work Plan, #6 Exhibit E - ADEM Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Access Agreement)(Sandick, Phil)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colonial Pipeline Company. filed by Colonial Pipeline Company (Sandick, Phil)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/6/2019. (CDG)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Motion to Dismiss Motion is RIPE 8/6/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Mathis, Alan)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorneys Meghan Boyd, W. Clay Massey and Phil Sandick, but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/1/2019. (AVC)
August 1, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3403182 (B4601099543). (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 8/1/2019 (MRR, ).
August 1, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3403177 (B4601099542). (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 8/1/2019 (MRR, ).
August 1, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3403169 (B4601099541). (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 8/1/2019 (MRR, ).
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Admit Pro Hac Vice Meghan Boyd, W. Clay Massey, Phil Sandick by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Cert of Good Standing and Application, #2 Exhibit B-Cert of Good Standing and Application, #3 Exhibit C-Cert of Good Sanding and Application)(Mathis, Alan)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorneys John W. Barrett, David McMullan, Jr., Richard R. Barrett, and Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr., but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/29/2019. (AVC)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC. filed by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC (Martino, Steven)
July 26, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number (ALND B 4601099414) 1126-3399277. (Martino, Steven) Modified on 7/29/2019 (AFS).
July 26, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number (ALND B 4601099413) 1126-3399275. (Martino, Steven) Modified on 7/29/2019 (AFS).
July 26, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, (ALND B 4601099412) receipt number 1126-3399272. (Martino, Steven) Modified on 7/29/2019 (AFS).
July 26, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, (ALND B4601099411) receipt number 1126-3399268. (Martino, Steven) Modified on 7/29/2019 (AFS).
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice- John W, Barrett, David McMullan, Jr, Richard R. Barrett, and Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr. Motion is RIPE 7/26/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A COGS Don Barrett, #2 Exhibit B COGS David McMullan, Jr., #3 Exhibit C COGS Richard Barrett, #4 Exhibit D COGS Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.)(Martino, Steven) Modified text on 7/26/2019 (MRR, ).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due August 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 07/12/2019. (CLS2)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Colonial Pipeline Company to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Motion is RIPE 7/12/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Mathis, Alan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Colonial Pipeline Company served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (AFS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Colonial Pipeline Company mailed certified mail. (AFS)
June 24, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, receipt_number (ALND B4601098625) 1126-3376410. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Colonial Pipeline Company, filed by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(AFS). (Martino, Steven) Modified on 6/25/2019 (AFS).
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Colonial Pipeline Company, filed by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC v. Colonial Pipeline Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Pipeline Company
Represented By: Phil Sandick
Represented By: W. Clay Massey
Represented By: Alan D Mathis
Represented By: Meaghan Goodwin Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC
Represented By: Steven A Martino
Represented By: David M. McMullan
Represented By: John W Barrett
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?