Kelly v. Unum Group Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Angela Kelly
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and Unum Group Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00985
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/6/2019. (KSS)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:15 AM; Bench Trial set for 2/8/2021 at 9:00 AM; BOTH in the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/5/2019. (AFS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group Corporation.(Fink, Douglas)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Defendants have until 8/2/2019 to file their responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/18/2019. (AFS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas W Fink on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group Corporation (Fink, Douglas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Tonsmeire Morrissette on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group Corporation (Morrissette, Henry)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group Corporation. (Fink, Douglas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (AFS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Unum Group Corporation served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (AFS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group Corporation mailed certified mail. (AFS)
June 25, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, (ALND B 4601098641) receipt_number 1126-3376892. related document #1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group Corporation, filed by Angela Kelly.(AFS). (Williams, Miles) Modified on 6/25/2019 (AFS).
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Angela Kelly. (Williams, Miles)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group Corporation, filed by Angela Kelly.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Unum Group Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Kelly
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Henry Tonsmeire Morrissette
Represented By: Douglas W Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group Corporation
Represented By: Henry Tonsmeire Morrissette
Represented By: Douglas W Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?