Everette v. Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc et al
Plaintiff: William Matthew Everette
Defendant: Wayne Hall, Danny Harrell, Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc and Donald Hall
Case Number: 2:2019cv00994
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adair, R)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Abdul K Kallon. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:19-cv-00994-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. The telephone status conference set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. (AFS)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/6/2019. (AFS)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 9/20/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 9/20/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on 9/6/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/6/2019. (AFS)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Donald Hall, Wayne Hall, Danny Harrell, Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc. filed by Donald Hall, Wayne Hall, Danny Harrell, Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc (Adair, R)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Donald Hall, Wayne Hall, Danny Harrell, Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc.(Adair, R)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' responsive pleading(s) is(are) due August 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 07/12/2019. (CLS2)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C Guarino on behalf of Donald Hall, Wayne Hall, Danny Harrell, Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc (Guarino, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 7/12/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Donald Hall, Wayne Hall, Danny Harrell, Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc. (Adair, R)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc served on 6/28/2019 (no date on green card) (AFS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Donald Hall served on 7/2/2019; Wayne Hall served on 7/2/2019; Danny Harrell served on 7/2/2019. (No date on green card) (AFS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donald Hall, Wayne Hall, Danny Harrell, Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc mailed certified mail. (AFS)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
June 25, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, (ALND B 4601098658) receipt_number 1126-3377682. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Donald Hall, Wayne Hall, Danny Harrell, Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc, filed by William Matthew Everette.(AFS). (Green, Wilson) Modified on 6/26/2019 (AFS).
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by William Matthew Everette. (AFS)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald Hall, Wayne Hall, Danny Harrell, Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc, filed by William Matthew Everette.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everette v. Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Hall
Represented By: R Brett Adair
Represented By: Michael C Guarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Harrell
Represented By: R Brett Adair
Represented By: Michael C Guarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrell & Hall Enterprises Inc
Represented By: R Brett Adair
Represented By: Michael C Guarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Hall
Represented By: R Brett Adair
Represented By: Michael C Guarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Matthew Everette
Represented By: Wilson F Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?