Lemons v. Cenlar FSB
Appellant: Eddie Lemons
Appellee: Cenlar FSB
Case Number: 2:2019cv01048
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The court hereby DISMISSES this appeal without prejudice for want of prosecution because the appellant has failed to pay the filing fees to the district court clerk within the time fixed by the rules. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 8/27/2019. (SRD)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 08/27/19. (JPW)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Cenlar FSB. (Humphries, Thomas)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Please note the filing fee for the appeal was not paid and neither party has filed designations for this appeal. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet (8-6-19), #2 18-Order Dismissing Case, #3 21-Notice of Appeal)(SRD)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE The Bankruptcy Clerk of Court has promptly transmitted a Notice of Appeal to this Court pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8003(d)(1). The court reminds the parties of the requirements of FederalRule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. Parties must file with the Bankruptcy Court their designations, transcript(s) and a statement of the issues to complete the record on appeal. When the record on appeal is complete, the Bankruptcy Clerk of Court will transmit the record to this Courts Clerk of Court. The Court will set a briefing schedule following the Bankruptcy Clerk of Courts notice of transmitting the record. (KAM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-01991-TOM13. File received, filed by Eddie Lemons. (Attachments: #1 Amended Submission, #2 USBC Docket Sheet, #3 Notice of Appeal, #4 Affidavit, #5 Order Dismissing case)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemons v. Cenlar FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Eddie Lemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cenlar FSB
Represented By: Thomas G Tutten, Jr
Represented By: Thomas B Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?