Clark v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Rikki Clark
Defendant: Life Insrance Company of North America and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01056
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 9/16/2019. (AFS)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by September 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/23/2019. (CDG)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint Motion is RIPE 8/23/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Murphy, Grace)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (AFS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
August 1, 2019 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Rikki Clark. (MRR, )
July 11, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B460109061 (AFS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Rikki Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rikki Clark
Represented By: Amanda Lane Stansberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insrance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?