Shearrer v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Plaintiff: David Shearrer
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01062
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 49:20109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/23/2019. (BST, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by David Shearrer, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (BST, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 9/20/2019 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 9/5/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 9/5/2019, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/8/2019. (KAM)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/8/2019. (BST)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc.(Frazier, Sydney)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Shearrer. Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (KAM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
July 12, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3388863, NDAL receipt #B4601099102. (Tucker, William) Modified on 7/12/2019 (JLC).
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by David Shearrer. (KAM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, filed by David Shearrer.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shearrer v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Shearrer
Represented By: William C Tucker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?