Graham v. HPT Sunbelt Portfolio LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jodi C Graham
Defendant: Hertz Investment Group LLC and HPT Sunbelt Portfolio LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01084
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/22/2019. (JLC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HPT Sunbelt Portfolio LLC, Hertz Investment Group LLC.(Bradford, Stacey)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER-This case is before the court on Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. #8 . The Motion #8 is GRANTED. On or before August 19, 2019, Defendants SHALL respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/5/2019. (KAM)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by HPT Sunbelt Portfolio LLC, Hertz Investment Group LLC. (Bradford, Stacey)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jodi C Graham. Hertz Investment Group LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (KAM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jodi C Graham. HPT Sunbelt Portfolio LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (KAM)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER-This case is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Exhibits A, B, C, and D attached to her Complaint. #3 . The Motion #3 is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to seal the exhibits attached to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/15/2019. (KEK)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to HPT Sunbelt Portfolio LLC, Hertz Investment Group LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint Exhibits A, B, C & D by Jodi C Graham. (Saxon, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jodi C Graham. (Saxon, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3388346 (ALND B4601099067) related document #1 COMPLAINT against HPT Sunbelt Portfolio LLC, Hertz Investment Group LLC, filed by Jodi C Graham. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KAM). (Saxon, John) Modified on 7/12/2019 (KEK).
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HPT Sunbelt Portfolio LLC, Hertz Investment Group LLC, filed by Jodi C Graham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. HPT Sunbelt Portfolio LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi C Graham
Represented By: John D Saxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Investment Group LLC
Represented By: Courtney C Morman
Represented By: Stacey T Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPT Sunbelt Portfolio LLC
Represented By: Courtney C Morman
Represented By: Stacey T Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?