Burgess v. MRS BPO, LLC d/b/a MRS Accociates et al
Plaintiff: Erskine Burgess
Defendant: NCB Management Services Inc, MRS BPO, LLC d/b/a MRS Accociates and MRS BPO LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01090
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER it is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties shall submit a formal stipulation of dismissal by 9/30/2019. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/14/2019. (AFS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement by Erskine Burgess (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/13/2019 (AFS).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/14/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 1:30 PM; Jury Trial set for 2/8/2021 at 9:00 AM; BOTH in the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/12/2019. (AFS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MRS BPO, LLC d/b/a MRS Accociates. filed by MRS BPO, LLC d/b/a MRS Accociates (Moore, Neal)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MRS BPO, LLC d/b/a MRS Accociates.(Moore, Neal)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. NCB Management Services Inc answer due 9/9/2019. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/7/2019. (AFS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NCB Management Services Inc. filed by NCB Management Services Inc (Nettles, Laura)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by NCB Management Services Inc. (Nettles, Laura)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed MRS BPO, LLC d/b/a MRS Accociates served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; NCB Management Services Inc served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (AFS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MRS BPO, LLC d/b/a MRS Accociates, NCB Management Services Inc. mailed certified mail. (AFS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford W Botes on behalf of Erskine Burgess (Botes, Bradford)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/15/2019. (AFS)
July 15, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, (ALND B4601099116) receipt number 1126-3389665. (Philipps, David) Modified on 7/15/2019 (AFS).
July 15, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, (ALND B4601099115) receipt number 1126-3389626. (Philipps, David) Modified on 7/15/2019 (AFS).
July 15, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, (ALND B4601099114) receipt_number 1126-3389620. related document #1 COMPLAINT against MRS BPO, LLC d/b/a MRS Accociates, NCB Management Services Inc, filed by Erskine Burgess. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(AFS). (Philipps, David) Modified on 7/15/2019 (AFS).
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hav Vice of David J. Phillips and Mary E. Phillips by Erskine Burgess. (AFS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Consent of Local Counsel by Erskine Burgess (AFS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Erskine Burgess. (AFS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MRS BPO, LLC d/b/a MRS Accociates, NCB Management Services Inc, filed by Erskine Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. MRS BPO, LLC d/b/a MRS Accociates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCB Management Services Inc
Represented By: Laura Catherine Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRS BPO, LLC d/b/a MRS Accociates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRS BPO LLC
Represented By: Neal D Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erskine Burgess
Represented By: Bradford W Botes
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?