Rubin v. Camping World Holdings Inc et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Rubin
Defendant: Camping World Holdings Inc, M&T Bank Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Winnebago Industries Inc and Emerald Coast RV Center LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01099
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/15/19. (SAC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint /Answer and Defenses of Defendants Winnebago Industries, Inc. and Emerald Coast RV Center, LLC by Emerald Coast RV Center LLC, Winnebago Industries Inc.(Dolive, Devin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Count Two by Defendants Winnebago Industries, Inc. and Emerald Coast RV Center, LLC and Incorporated Brief in Support by Emerald Coast RV Center LLC, Winnebago Industries Inc. (Dolive, Devin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Defenses of Defendant M&T Bank by M&T Bank Corporation.(Dolive, Devin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Defenses of Defendant Camping World Holdings, Inc. by Camping World Holdings Inc.(Dolive, Devin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION /Joint Stipulation Regarding Identity of Defendant M&T Bank by Emerald Coast RV Center LLC, M&T Bank Corporation. filed by Emerald Coast RV Center LLC, M&T Bank Corporation (Dolive, Devin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by M&T Bank Corporation (Dolive, Devin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Emerald Coast RV Center LLC (Dolive, Devin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Camping World Holdings Inc (Dolive, Devin)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Camping World Holdings, Emerald Coast RV Center, and M&T Bank Corporation shall file a responsive pleading on or before August 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/2/2019. (KMG)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Camping World Holdings Inc, Emerald Coast RV Center LLC, M&T Bank Corporation, Winnebago Industries Inc. (Dolive, Devin)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Camping World Holdings Inc responsive pleading due 8/5/2019; Emerald Coast RV Center LLC responsive pleading due 8/5/2019; M&T Bank Corporation responsive pleading due 8/5/2019; Winnebago Industries Inc responsive pleading due 8/5/2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/22/2019. (KMG)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Emerald Coast RV Center LLC, M&T Bank Corporation, Winnebago Industries Inc. (Dolive, Devin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Winnebago Industries Inc. filed by Winnebago Industries Inc (Dolive, Devin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 JOINDER in re #1 Joinder in and Consent to Notice of Removal filed by Camping World Holdings Inc, Emerald Coast RV Center LLC, M&T Bank Corporation, Winnebago Industries Inc. (Dolive, Devin)
July 16, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3390442 (ALND B4601099155) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2019-902570, filed by Ford Motor Company.(KEK). (Cannon, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/16/2019 (KEK).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company. (KEK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (KEK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2019-902570, filed by Ford Motor Company.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubin v. Camping World Holdings Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World Holdings Inc
Represented By: Devin Clarke Dolive
Represented By: Stuart F Vargo
Represented By: S Greg Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Represented By: Devin Clarke Dolive
Represented By: Stuart F Vargo
Represented By: S Greg Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Bartow Cannon, Jr.
Represented By: Rudolph Woods Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago Industries Inc
Represented By: Devin Clarke Dolive
Represented By: Stuart F Vargo
Represented By: S Greg Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald Coast RV Center LLC
Represented By: Devin Clarke Dolive
Represented By: Stuart F Vargo
Represented By: S Greg Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Rubin
Represented By: Michael Parrish
Represented By: Thomas C. Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?