Rouss v. Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jack P Rouss, Jr
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, Ditech Financial LLC and Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01162
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Ditech Financial LLC answer due 9/22/2019; Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC answer due 9/22/2019; Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB answer due 9/22/2019. (AFS)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion to Dismiss; granting #11 Motion to Enjoin the Circuit Court from Proceeding in the State Court Action; granting in part #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The Defendants' responsive pleading is due 9/22/2019. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/12/2019. (AFS)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oswalt, Cheryl)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss (Mooted since complaint amended) filed by Jack P Rouss, Jr. (Watts, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, filed by Jack P Rouss, Jr.(Watts, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Enjoin by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Circuit Court)(Kelly, Megan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Moore Kelly on behalf of Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Kelly, Megan)
August 8, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/28/2019 Replies due by 9/4/2019. (AFS)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Jack Rouss' motion for extension of time #6 is GRANTED. Rouss' response to Defendants' motion to dismiss #2 is due by 8/28/2019; Defendants' reply, if any, is due by 9/4/2019. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/8/2019. (AFS)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (Ortega, Juan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by M Stan Herring, Jr on behalf of Jack P Rouss, Jr (Herring, M)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Jack P Rouss, Jr. (Wallace, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Ortega, Juan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC.(Ortega, Juan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Before the court is Defendant Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB's Motion to Dismiss #2 . Plaintiff's response is due by 8/8/2019, defendant's reply, if any, is due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/30/2019. (AFS)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (Ortega, Juan)
July 24, 2019 Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3396869 (ALND B 4601099342)(Oswalt, Cheryl) Modified on 7/24/2019 (AFS).
July 23, 2019 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Russell Priddy on behalf of Ditech Financial LLC. Deemed filed on in Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama on 7/17/2019. (Page 143 of Exhibit A) (AFS)
July 23, 2019 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Ditech Financial LLC by Ditech Financial LLC. filed by Ditech Financial LLC. Deemed filed in Circuit Court, Shelby County, Alabama on 7/16/2019 (Page 41 of Exhibit A) (AFS)
July 23, 2019 COMPLAINT against Ditech Financial LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, filed by Jack P Rouss, Jr. Deemed filed 6/4/2019 in Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama. (Page 3 of Exhibit A)(AFS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ditech Financial LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-CV-2019-900630.00., filed by Ditech Financial LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouss v. Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Represented By: Cheryl Howell Oswalt
Represented By: Juan C Ortega
Represented By: Megan Moore Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Cheryl Howell Oswalt
Represented By: Juan C Ortega
Represented By: Graham W Gerhardt
Represented By: Ryan Russell Priddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Represented By: Cheryl Howell Oswalt
Represented By: Juan C Ortega
Represented By: Megan Moore Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack P Rouss, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Wallace
Represented By: Michael Evans Wallace
Represented By: M Stan Herring, Jr
Represented By: John G Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?