Goodwin v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: George Goodwin
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01169
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER IN ERISA BENEFITS CASES. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/13/2019. (KEK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. (AFS)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Walters, Jason)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/15/2019. (AFS)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 9/30/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 9/30/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on 9/13/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/15/2019. (AFS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kriston Laney Gifford on behalf of The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Gifford, Kriston)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Walters, Jason)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Walters, Jason)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company mailed certified mail. (AFS)
July 23, 2019 Filing Fee:$400.00, receipt_number 1126-3396224 (ALND B4601099326). (Williams, Miles) Modified on 7/23/2019 (AFS).
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by George Goodwin. (Williams, Miles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, filed by George Goodwin.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Goodwin
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Represented By: Ariel S Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason A Walters
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?