Brookside Properties Inc v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Brookside Properties Inc
Defendant: Henry Johnson, III
Case Number: 2:2019cv01170
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Henry Johnson III (KAM)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - This case is before the court on Defendant Henry Johnson, III's (Defendant) Notice of Removal and Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion filed contemporaneously with this Order, Defendant's case is REMANDED to the Jefferson County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/4/2019. (KEK)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION - This court lacks federal subject-matter jurisdiction over Defendant's claim. For the reasons stated above, Defendant's case is due to be remanded. An Order consistent with this Memorandum will follow. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/4/2019. (KEK)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/4/2019. (KAM)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1170-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER- The removing deft has failed to respond to the show cause order (Doc #4 ) within the time prescribed; None of the "triggering events" of the General Order have occurred in this case, and it appears no such event will occur in a timely manner; The case is now due to be assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/28/19. (MRR, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- For the reasons stated within, Mr. Johnson is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within (10) calendar days why this matter should not be remanded for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/8/19. (MRR, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 7/23/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Henry Johnson, III. (MRR, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Henry Johnson, III from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-DV-2019-903062., filed by Henry Johnson, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brookside Properties Inc v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brookside Properties Inc
Represented By: Jim M Sandefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?