Guest v. O'Reilly Automotive Inc et al
Plaintiff: David Guest
Defendant: Omni Specialty Packaging LLC, O'Reily Automotive Stores Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc and Ozark Automotive Distributors Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01172
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jones, Rhon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by David Guest Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Disclosures (Jones, Rhon)
September 4, 2019 PHV Fee paid for Clayton A. Jones in the amount of $75.00, receipt number B4601100371. (JLC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by David Guest Certificate of Service of Discovery Served for all Defendants (Jones, Rhon)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Before the court is a #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of attorney Clayton A. Jones; the motion is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED; On or before September 11, 2019, Attorney Jones SHALL Pay the $75.00 Pro Hac Vice admission fee; and Certify to the court that he has read and understands:(a) any local rules applicable in this District;(b) the Alabama State Bar Code of Professional Courtesy and the Lawyers Creed, which can be accessed at:https://www.alabar.org/membership/code-of-professional-courtesy/;https://www.alabar.org/membership/lawyers-creed/ ; and(c) this courts CM/ECF requirements.Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/4/2019. (KAM)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Limited Admission of Clayton A. Jones by David Guest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jones, Rhon)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. by David Guest. filed by David Guest (Jones, Rhon)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by O'Reilly Automotive Inc, O'Reily Automotive Stores Inc, Omni Specialty Packaging LLC, Ozark Automotive Distributors Inc.(Berra, Thomas)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/5/2019. (KAM)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. The telephone conference set for July 31, 2019 is CANCELLED. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1172-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The defendants have filed an unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. 5). The motion is GRANTED. The defendants shall file their responsive pleading(s) on or before August 27, 2019. This case is SET for a telephone status conference on July 31, 2019 at 11:15 A.M. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/26/19. (MRR, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The motions for admission pro hac vice of Dirk L. Hubbard (Doc. #6 ), Thomas V. Bender (Doc. #7 ), Will L. Carr (Doc. #8 ), Bryan T. White (Doc. #9 ), Thomas P. Berra, Jr. (Doc. #10 ), and Edward T. Pivin (Doc. #11 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/26/19. (MRR, )
July 26, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3398660 (B4601099387). (Ford, Sara) Modified on 7/26/2019 (MRR, ).
July 26, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3398655 (B4601099386). (Ford, Sara) Modified on 7/26/2019 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice- Edward T. Pivin by O'Reilly Automotive Inc, O'Reily Automotive Stores Inc, Omni Specialty Packaging LLC, Ozark Automotive Distributors Inc. (Ford, Sara) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice- Thomas P Berra Jr. by O'Reilly Automotive Inc, O'Reily Automotive Stores Inc, Omni Specialty Packaging LLC, Ozark Automotive Distributors Inc. (Ford, Sara) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3398191 (B4601099374). (Jones, Rhon) Modified on 7/26/2019 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3398188 (B4601099373). (Jones, Rhon) Modified on 7/26/2019 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3398183 (B4601099372). (Jones, Rhon) Modified on 7/26/2019 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3398175 (B4601099371). (Jones, Rhon) Modified on 7/26/2019 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice- Bryan T. White Motion is RIPE 7/25/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by David Guest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jones, Rhon) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice- William L. Carr Motion is RIPE 7/25/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by David Guest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jones, Rhon) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice- Thomas V. Bender Motion is RIPE 7/25/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by David Guest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jones, Rhon) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice- Dirk L. Hubbard Motion is RIPE 7/25/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by David Guest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jones, Rhon) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint Motion is RIPE 7/25/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by O'Reilly Automotive Inc, O'Reily Automotive Stores Inc, Omni Specialty Packaging LLC, Ozark Automotive Distributors Inc. (Ford, Sara)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omni Specialty Packaging LLC. filed by Omni Specialty Packaging LLC (Ford, Sara)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by O'Reilly Automotive Inc, O'Reily Automotive Stores Inc, Ozark Automotive Distributors Inc. filed by O'Reilly Automotive Inc, O'Reily Automotive Stores Inc, Ozark Automotive Distributors Inc (Ford, Sara)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
July 23, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3396478 (B4601099329). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2019-902837., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MRR, ). (Ford, Sara) Modified on 7/24/2019 (MRR, ).
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2019-902837., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guest v. O'Reilly Automotive Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Specialty Packaging LLC
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Represented By: Edward T Pivin
Represented By: Thomas P Berra, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reily Automotive Stores Inc
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Represented By: Edward T Pivin
Represented By: Thomas P Berra, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Inc
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Represented By: Edward T Pivin
Represented By: Thomas P Berra, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Automotive Distributors Inc
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Represented By: Edward T Pivin
Represented By: Thomas P Berra, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Guest
Represented By: Rhon E Jones
Represented By: Thomas Bender
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: William L. Carr
Represented By: Dirk L Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?