Richardson v. Watson
Plaintiff: John W Richardson
Defendant: Rochelle Watson
Case Number: 2:2019cv01189
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER the court finds that this action is due to be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/7/2019. (KAM)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to re #3 filed by John W Richardson. (KAM)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/5/2019. (KAM)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Plaintiff shall show cause in writing by 8/23/2019, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/29/2019. (KAM)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John W Richardson. (KAM)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rochelle Watson, filed by John W Richardson.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?