Trawick et al v. Berthel Fisher & Company Financial Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Chad Greer, Jerry Trawick, Marilyn Bjornas, Michelle Greer and Louise Trawick
Defendant: Berthel Fisher & Company Financial Services Inc, Jerry D McCutchen, Sr, Ronald Brendengen, Thomas Berthel and Richard Murphy
Case Number: 2:2019cv01199
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER the courts prior order of dismissal #5 isVACATED IN PART, as it relates to the dismissal of Petitioners claims againstRespondent Jerry McCutchen. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED toto REOPEN this case, and the Petitioners claims against Respondent JerryMcCutcheon are hereby REINSTATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/20/2019. (KAM)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice; each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/19/2019. (KAM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Marilyn Bjornas, Chad Greer, Michelle Greer, Jerry Trawick, Louise Trawick (Mougey, Peter)
August 14, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3412046. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Berthel, Berthel Fisher & Company Financial Services Inc, Ronald Brendengen, Jerry D McCutchen, Sr, Richard Murphy, filed by Louise Trawick, Chad Greer, Michelle Greer, Jerry Trawick, Marilyn Bjornas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KAM). (Mougey, Peter) NDAL rec# B4601099874 Modified on 8/15/2019 (KAM).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 08/06/19. (SUH)
August 5, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3405359. (Mougey, Peter)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael C. Bixby Motion is RIPE 8/5/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Marilyn Bjornas, Chad Greer, Michelle Greer, Jerry Trawick, Louise Trawick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mougey, Peter)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Berthel, Berthel Fisher & Company Financial Services Inc, Ronald Brendengen, Jerry D McCutchen, Sr, Richard Murphy, filed by Louise Trawick, Chad Greer, Michelle Greer, Jerry Trawick, Marilyn Bjornas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trawick et al v. Berthel Fisher & Company Financial Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Greer
Represented By: Peter James Mougey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Trawick
Represented By: Peter James Mougey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Bjornas
Represented By: Peter James Mougey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Greer
Represented By: Peter James Mougey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Trawick
Represented By: Peter James Mougey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berthel Fisher & Company Financial Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry D McCutchen, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Brendengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Berthel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?