Melton v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Marie Melton
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01207
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Upon consideration of the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. 9), the court ORDERS that this case be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED, in its entirety, WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/26/2019. (FNC)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Marie Melton. filed by Marie Melton (Burke, Peter) Modified on 9/26/2019 (JLC).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - ERISA CASES BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE BOWDRE - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/13/2019. (FNC)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Murphy, Grace)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America's responsive pleading is now due on or before September 19, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/28/19. (MMW)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Murphy, Grace)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Melton. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (JLC)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America via certified U.S. Mail on this the 6th day of August, 2019. (JLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3403143, NDAL receipt #B4601099540.(Burke, Peter) Modified on 8/1/2019 (JLC).
July 29, 2019 Request for service by certified mail (found within doc #1 ) filed by Marie Melton. (KWC)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Marie Melton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melton v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Melton
Represented By: Peter H Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Matthew S Edinger
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William B Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?