Bey v. Pettway et al
Plaintiff: Wilek Abraham Bey
Defendant: Mark Pettway, Officer Haney, Barrington Reality and Jefferson County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv01233
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. (AFS)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - The deadline to file an amended complaint has now passed, and Plaintiff has failed to submit one. Therefore, it appears the complaint is due to be dismissed for want of prosecution. Independently, the complaint appears due to be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted for the reasons stated in the previous order, #10 . See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) (requiring sua sponte dismissal of an IFP plaintiffs complaint when, inter alia, if fails to state a claim on which relief may be granted). However, the undersigned lacks dispositive jurisdiction to dismiss the complaint. Further, because the complaint is due to be dismissed prior to service on the defendant, the undersigned will not be able to obtain consent from all parties under 28 U.S.C. 636 in order to exercise dispositive jurisdiction. Therefore, consistent with the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/25/2019. (AFS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail Order #10 sent to Wilek Abraham Bey returned (Temporarily Away Unable to Forward). (AFS)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Plaintiff must file another amended complaint, consistent with this order, by 9/17/2019. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time prescribed may result in the dismissal of all claims for want of prosecution. See FED. R. CIV. P. 41 (b). Service of process will not begin until an amended complaint complying with this order is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/27/2019. (AFS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barrington Reality, Officer Haney, Jefferson County Sheriff's Department, Mark Pettway, filed by Wilek Abraham Bey.(AFS)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Plaintiff must still submit an amended complaint, following the directions in the previous order, by 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/13/2019. (AFS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Writ Mandamus by Wilek Abraham Bey (AFS)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barrington Reality, Officer Haney, Jefferson County Sheriff's Department, Mark Pettway with Jury Demand, filed by Wilek Abraham Bey.(AFS)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - On August 1, 2019, the plaintiff filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis requesting to commence this action without prepayment of fees or costs or the giving of security. (Doc. #2 ). Having reviewed the plaintiffs motion, the undersigned finds that the plaintiff is indigent. Therefore, the motion is GRANTED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1) to the extent the plaintiff may commence this action without prepayment of fees or costs or the giving of security. However, for the reasons discussed below, the plaintiff will be required to file an amended complaint. For these reasons, the plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint bearing this case number (2:19-cv-01233-JHE) on the first page within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/2/2019. (KEK)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Evidentiary Material in Support #1 Complaint filed by Wilek Abraham Bey. (JLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (JLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Motion is RIPE 8/1/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Wilek Abraham Bey. (JLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barrington Reality, Officer Haney, Jefferson County Sheriff's Department, Mark Pettway, filed by Wilek Abraham Bey.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Pettway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Pettway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrington Reality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilek Abraham Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?