Cochise LLC v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cochise LLC
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01262
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain deadlines apply as further set out within. Discovery due by 9/1/2020; Dispositve Motions due by 9/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/2/19. (MRR, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Johnson, John)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: the telephone status conference set for 10:30 a.m. on September 3, 2019, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/27/2019. (MSN)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/27/19. (MRR, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/15/19. (MRR, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than September 30, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after September 30, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on September 3, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/15/19. (MRR, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide General Insurance Company.(Johnson, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Bruce on behalf of Cochise LLC (Bruce, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3406954 (B4601099687). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide General Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2019-903001., filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(MRR, ). (Johnson, John) Modified on 8/7/2019 (MRR, ).
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Nationwide General Insurance Company (MRR, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide General Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2019-903001., filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochise LLC v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: John W Johnson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cochise LLC
Represented By: Steven D Barnett
Represented By: Keith T Belt, Jr
Represented By: Wayne A Duke, Jr
Represented By: Robert P Bruner
Represented By: William Ryan Myers
Represented By: David Lee Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?