Tapp v. Board of Trustees of The University of Alabama, The
Plaintiff: Erin A Tapp
Defendant: Board of Trustees of The University of Alabama, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv01265
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 10/7/2019 Replies due by 10/14/2019. (KAM)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Upon agreement of the parties, the briefing schedule on the #5 motion to dismiss is AMENDED as follows: Plaintiff SHALL file a response to the motion by October 7, 2019. Defendant may file a reply by October 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 09/26/2019. (SUH)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 10/21/2019 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 10/8/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 10/8/2019, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/10/2019. (KAM)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/15/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/10/2019. (BST, )
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Defendant has filed a #5 motion to dismiss the complaint pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 12(b)(1) and contends the complaint is time-barred. Plaintiff SHALL file a response to the motion by September 23, 2019. Defendant may file a reply by September 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 09/09/2019. (SUH)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer A Kinderman on behalf of Board of Trustees of The University of Alabama, The (Kinderman, Spencer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Board of Trustees of The University of Alabama, The. (Mellon, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erin A Tapp. Board of Trustees of The University of Alabama, The served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (KAM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Board of Trustees of The University of Alabama, The. mailed certified mail (KAM)
August 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3407951. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Board of Trustees of The University of Alabama, The, filed by Erin A Tapp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KAM). (Saxon, John) NDAL rec# B4601099740 Modified on 8/14/2019 (KAM, ).
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Erin A Tapp. (KAM)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Trustees of The University of Alabama, The, filed by Erin A Tapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tapp v. Board of Trustees of The University of Alabama, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of The University of Alabama, The
Represented By: David R Mellon
Represented By: Spencer A Kinderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin A Tapp
Represented By: John D Saxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?