Gestamp Alabama LLC et al v. Facil North America Inc
Plaintiff: Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp Alabama LLC and Gestamp South Carolina LLC
Defendant: Facil North America Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01283
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that with the agreement of the parties, Plaintiff's request for a Preliminary Injunction is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, subject to Plaintiff's right to reinstate the request for such relief if settlement discussions and/or mediation are unsuccessful. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/23/2019. (JLC)
August 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 8/23/2019. A separate order will be entered by the court. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (KLL)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A Rowe on behalf of Facil North America Inc (Rowe, Stephen)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER; This matter is before the court on the parties' Joint Status Report #11 . A telephone conference is SET to discuss the Joint Status Report #11 on AUGUST 23, 2019 at 10:30 a.m.. The parties' are DIRECTED to call 866-434-5269 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 6022965. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/16/2019. (JLC)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron G McLeod on behalf of Facil North America Inc (McLeod, Aaron)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Gestamp Alabama LLC, Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp South Carolina LLC. filed by Gestamp Alabama LLC, Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp South Carolina LLC (Loper, Regan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/12/2019, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Risa L. Entrekin. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2019. (KAM, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER In light of the courts Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #8 , Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Hearing #4 is MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/13/2019. (KAM)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO; The parties are ORDERED to submit a joint report by AUGUST 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. summarizing the remaining dispute(s) and clarifying further guidance needed from the court. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/12/2019. (KAM)
August 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 8/12/2019. (Court Reporter Risa Entrekin.) (KLL)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #2 and Motion for Expedited Hearing #4 . These Motions are SET for a telephone conference at 3:30 p.m. today, Monday, August 12, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 866-434-5269 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 6022965. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/12/2019. (KAM)
August 12, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3409749. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Facil North America Inc, filed by Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp Alabama LLC, Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp South Carolina LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(KAM). (Carson, D)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gestamp Alabama LLC, Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp South Carolina LLC. filed by Gestamp Alabama LLC, Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp South Carolina LLC (Carson, D)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on TRO Motion, #3 Affidavit, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Rule 65(b) Certification by D Christopher Carson on behalf of Gestamp Alabama LLC, Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp South Carolina LLC (Carson, D)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on TRO Motion by Gestamp Alabama LLC, Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp South Carolina LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carson, D)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Gestamp Alabama LLC, Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp South Carolina LLC. filed by Gestamp Alabama LLC, Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp South Carolina LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Carson, D)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Gestamp Alabama LLC, Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp South Carolina LLC. (Carson, D)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Facil North America Inc, filed by Gestamp Mason LLC, Gestamp Alabama LLC, Gestamp Lapeer LLC, Gestamp South Carolina LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gestamp Alabama LLC et al v. Facil North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gestamp Lapeer LLC
Represented By: Regan Coleman Loper
Represented By: D Christopher Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gestamp Mason LLC
Represented By: Regan Coleman Loper
Represented By: D Christopher Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gestamp Alabama LLC
Represented By: Regan Coleman Loper
Represented By: D Christopher Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gestamp South Carolina LLC
Represented By: Regan Coleman Loper
Represented By: D Christopher Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facil North America Inc
Represented By: Stephen A Rowe
Represented By: Aaron G McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?