Locust Fork, Town of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Locust Fork, Town of
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Allergan PLC, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Purdue Pharma Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Noramco Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01286
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Locust Fork, Town of as to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. (KAM)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Northern Ohio. (KAM)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Locust Fork, Town of. Actavis LLC served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019; Endo Health Solutions Inc served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (KAM)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting the defendants' motion for an additional 60 days to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. #11 Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 9/3/2019. (Ott, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Locust Fork, Town of. Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (KAM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Motion is RIPE 8/30/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Strubel, J)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Locust Fork, Town of. Cardinal Health Inc served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Johnson & Johnson served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (KAM)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, J)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by H Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, H)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Locust Fork, Town of. Actavis Pharma Inc served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; McKesson Corporation served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Noramco Inc served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Purdue Pharma Inc served (no date on green card); Purdue Pharma LP served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Watson Laboratories Inc served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (KEK)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Locust Fork, Town of. Cephalon Inc served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (KEK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. mailed certified mail (KAM)
August 13, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3411532. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, filed by Locust Fork, Town of.(KAM). (Sutton, William)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Locust Fork, Town of (KAM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Locust Fork, Town of. (KAM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, filed by Locust Fork, Town of.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locust Fork, Town of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: H Lanier Brown, II
Represented By: David L Brown, Jr
Represented By: J Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Locust Fork, Town of
Represented By: Rhon E Jones
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Jere L Beasley
Represented By: William J Sherrer
Represented By: Richard D Stratton
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?