Wadsworth v. Nash et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Glenn Wadsworth
Defendant: Libby Nash and City of Oneonta, AL
Case Number: 2:2019cv01292
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the magistrate judge RECOMMENDS that this matter be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute; objections to the R&R are due within 14 days from the date of the R&R as more fully set out thereon. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/9/2019. (AHI)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The undersigned ORDERS the plaintiff to sign and return to the Clerk of Court, within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order, the attached Prisoner Consent Form to signify that he wishes to continue with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 8/29/2019. (SRD)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Darryl Glenn Wadsworth. (JLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Oneonta, AL, Libby Nash, filed by Darryl Glenn Wadsworth.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wadsworth v. Nash et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Glenn Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Libby Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oneonta, AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?