Lumpkin et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Lumpkin, Sandra Escott Russell and CR 2018 LLC
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Sundra Escott Russell, Wedzell Escott, Ruth Escott and Deborah Escott Lumpkin
Case Number: 2:2019cv01299
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 Amended MOTION To Realign Parties re #18 MOTION Motion to Realign Parties , #18 MOTION Motion to Realign Parties filed by Deborah Lumpkin. (Lay, Kenneth)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Counter-Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Response to Motion for Realignment of the Parties #24 . Counter-Plaintiff's propose an extension of the deadline to October 7, 2019. The Motion #24 is unopposed. For good cause shown, the Motion #24 is GRANTED. Counter-Plaintiff's shall respond on or before October 7, 2019. Counter-Defendant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before October 15, 2019. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/1/2019. (KAM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Amended MOTION To Realign Parties re #18 MOTION Motion to Realign Parties by Sundra Escott Russell. (Lay, Kenneth)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company's Amended Motion to Realign Parties #21 . The case SHALL remain stayed pending resolution of the Motion to Remand #7 , Motion to Dismiss [1-2], and Amended Motion to Realign Parties #21 . The parties are ORDERED to brief the Motion #21 is accordance with Exhibit B of the court's Initial Order #22 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/26/2019. (KAM)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/26/2019. (KAM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 21 Amended MOTION To Realign Parties re #18 MOTION Motion to Realign Parties by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Melton, Allison)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Deborah Lumpkin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agee decision--Judge Proctor, #2 Exhibit Scarber decision --Judge Proctor)(Lay, Kenneth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Court Action to All Parties, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - CSC Ocwen Service Page Dismissal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Deutsche Bank Fed Reserve Address Information)(Melton, Allison)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION Motion to Realign Parties by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Melton, Allison) Modified on 9/26/2019 (KAM, ).
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1299-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Responses due by 9/16/2019. Replies due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 09/06/2019. (RCP)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Melton, Allison) Modified text on 9/6/2019 (MRR, ).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER- Addressing counterclaimants Deborah Lumpkin and Sundra Escott Russell's Motion to Stay Proceedings (Doc #8 ); It is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and all proceedings, including any discovery, are STAYED pending the court's resolution of the motion to remand (Doc #7 ) and, if necessary, the motion to dismiss (Doc #1 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/29/19. (MRR, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Melton, Allison)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William L Waudby on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (Waudby, William)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than October 3, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after October 3, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 2:00 p.m. on September 11, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/23/19. (MRR, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Deborah Lumpkin, Deborah Escott Lumpkin, Sundra Escott Russell. On or before 08/28/2019, any party shall show cause, if any exists, as to why the motion (Doc. 8) should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 08/21/2019. (RCP)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sundra Escott Russell. The nonmovants shall file a response to the motion on or before 09/06/2019, and the movant may file a reply on or before 09/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 08/21/2019. (RCP)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Deborah Lumpkin, Deborah Escott Lumpkin, Sundra Escott Russell. (Lay, Kenneth)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sundra Escott Russell. (Lay, Kenneth)
August 16, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601099911. (KEK)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/16/2019. (KMAW)
August 15, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3413143. (Shaner, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shaner, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Shaner, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (Shaner, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3412267 (B4601099880). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2018-904743., filed by counter defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2, # 3 Exhibit A part 3, # 4 Exhibit A part 4, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C)(MRR, ) Modified on 8/14/2019 (MRR, ).. (Shaner, John) Modified on 8/15/2019 (MRR, ).
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 13, 2019 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.- Deemed filed 7/17/19 Jefferson County Circuit Court (Doc 1-2 p.59 of 81) (MRR, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order PRO TANTO ORDER OF DISMISSAL- The Motion to Dismiss filed by Pltf CR 2018 is GRANTED and all claims in this case are hereby DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, costs taxed as paid; All other claims by and against all other parties in this case remain pending. Signed by Circuit Judge Jim Hughey on 7/11/19- Deemed filed 7/11/19 Jefferson County Circuit Court (Doc 1-2 p.56 of 81) (MRR, )
August 13, 2019 SUPPLEMENT to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss by CR 2018 LLC - Deemed filed 7/11/19 Jefferson County Circuit Court (Doc 1-2 p. 40 of 81) (MRR, )
August 13, 2019 MOTION to Dismiss by CR 2018 LLC.-Deemed filed 6/7/19 Jefferson County Circuit Court (Doc 1-2 p.3 of 81) (MRR, )
August 13, 2019 ANSWER and COUNTERCLAIM against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC by Deborah Escott Lumpkin, Sundra Escott Russell -Deemed served 5/14/19 Jefferson County Circuit Court (Doc 1-1 p.56 of 120)(MRR, )
August 13, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CR 2018 LLC.- Deemed filed 3/20/19 Jefferson County Circuit Court (Doc 1-1 p.25 of 120)(MRR, ) Modified text on 8/29/2019 (MRR, ).
August 13, 2019 SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Ruth Escott and Wedzell Escott filed by Deborah Escott Lumpkin, Sundra Escott Russell, Wedzell Escott, Ruth Escott- Deemed filed 12/10/18 Jefferson County Circuit Court (Doc 1-1 p.21 of 120) (MRR, )
August 13, 2019 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Lay on behalf of Ruth Escott, Wedzell Escott, Deborah Escott Lumpkin, Sundra Escott Russell-Deemed filed 12/10/18 Jefferson County Circuit Court (Doc 1-1 p 14 of 120) (MRR, )
August 13, 2019 COMPLAINT against Ruth Escott, Wedzell Escott, Deborah Lumpkin, filed by CR 2018 LLC.-Deemed filed 11/27/18 Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p3 of 120)(MRR, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2018-904743., filed by counter defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2, #3 Exhibit A part 3, #4 Exhibit A part 4, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(MRR, ) Modified on 8/14/2019 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lumpkin et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lumpkin
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Escott Russell
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CR 2018 LLC
Represented By: Joseph Todd Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: John Houston Shaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: John Houston Shaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundra Escott Russell
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wedzell Escott
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Escott
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Escott Lumpkin
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?