Thomas v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama
Plaintiff: Tracy Thomas
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama
Case Number: 2:2019cv01300
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Mays, Stephanie)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER . Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/17/2019. (KEK)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1300-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama.(Mays, Stephanie)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (MRR, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
August 15, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3413216 (ALND B4601099913 related document #1 COMPLAINT against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, filed by Tracy Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MRR, ). (Beeman, Robert) Modified on 8/16/2019 (KEK).
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Tracy Thomas. (Cooks, Roderick)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 14, 2019 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Tracy Thomas. (MRR, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, filed by Tracy Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Thomas
Represented By: Robert L Beeman, II
Represented By: Roderick T Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama
Represented By: Stephanie H Mays
Represented By: William Brock Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?