Hulsey v. State of Alabama
Plaintiff: Olin Dale Hulsey
Defendant: State of Alabama, City of Birmingham Police Department, Department of Veterans Affairs, State of Florida and Birmingham, City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv01310
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (no such number). Mail sent to Olin Dale Hulsey (Doc 4). (KEK)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #1 : For the reasons explained above, the court DENIES Mr. Hulseys requests for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/19/2019. (KEK)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Coming before the court is Plaintiff Olin Dale Hulseys motion to proceed proceed in forma pauperis and for appointment of counsel. (Doc. #2 ). Because Mr. Hulseys affidavit demonstrates that he is unable to pay the courts filing fee, the court GRANTS Mr. Hulseys motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The court DEFERS ruling on the motion for appointment of counsel until the court has had an opportunity to screen Mr. Hulseys complaint as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/15/2019. (KEK)
August 14, 2019 MOTION for Immediate Court Intervention and Protection Order/Custody by Olin Dale Hulsey. *See Doc 1, page 1*** (KEK)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Olin Dale Hulsey. (KEK)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Alabama, filed by Olin Dale Hulsey.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hulsey v. State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Birmingham Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olin Dale Hulsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?