Frazier v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marquetta Frazier
Defendant: Lincoln Life Insurance Company and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv01315
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than October 25, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after October 25, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on October 23, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/11/19. (MRR, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/11/19. (MRR, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. filed by Lincoln Life Insurance Company (Walters, Jason) Modified on 9/11/2019 (MRR, ).
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The.(Walters, Jason) Modified on 9/11/2019 (MRR, ).
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (MRR, ) Modified on 9/11/2019 (MRR, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The, sent via certified mail (MRR, ) Modified on 9/11/2019 (MRR, ).
August 15, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3412836 (ALND B4601099902) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Insurance Company, filed by Marquetta Frazier.(MRR, ). (Pennington, John) Modified on 8/16/2019 (KEK).
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Marquetta Frazier. (MRR, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The, filed by Marquetta Frazier.(MRR, ) Modified on 9/11/2019 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Jason A Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquetta Frazier
Represented By: John M Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?